US HB69 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 516.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 516.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Illegal, Unreported, and Unregulated Fishing Enforcement Act of 2013 - Amends the High Seas Driftnet Fishing Moratorium Protection Act to direct the Secretary of Commerce (Secretary) and the Secretary of the department in which the Coast Guard is operating to enforce that Act and the Pacific Salmon Treaty Act of 1985, the Dolphin Protection Consumer Information Act, the Tuna Conventions Act of 1950, the North Pacific Anadromous Stocks Act of 1992, the South Pacific Tuna Act of 1988, the Antarctic Marine Living Resources Convention Act of 1984, the Atlantic Tunas Convention Act of 1975, the Northwest Atlantic Fisheries Convention Act of 1995, and the Western and Central Pacific Fisheries Convention Implementation Act. Amends several of such Acts as well as the High Seas Driftnet Fisheries Enforcement Act, High Seas Fishing Compliance Act of 1995, Northern Pacific Halibut Act of 1982, and Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act to revise violations, penalties, permit requirements, port privileges, illegal, unreported, or unregulated (IUU) fishing sanctions, and other enforcement authority. Authorizes additional enforcement measures relating to search or inspection of facilities or conveyances, records inspection, shipment detention, arrest, search and seizure, and service of civil or criminal process. Authorizes the Secretary to disclose certain information to state or federal agencies or internationally to ensure compliance with measures the Secretary enforces, including international fishery agreements. Authorizes: (1) the development and publication of a list of vessels engaged in IUU fishing, including vessels or owners identified by an international fishery management organization or arrangement made pursuant to an international fishery agreement; and (2) taking action against listed vessels. Requires identification and listing of nations that: (1) violate conservation and management measures required under an international fishery management agreement to which the United States is a party, or (2) fail to effectively address or regulate IUU fishing. Extends provisions applicable to nations to other entities that have competency to enter into international fishery management agreements. Authorizes international cooperation and assistance, including grants, to help other nations achieve sustainable fisheries. Antigua Convention Implementing Act of 2011 [sic] - Amends the Tuna Conventions Act of 1950 to revise provisions regarding: (1) the Inter-American Tropical Tuna Commission, (2) the General Advisory Committee, (3) the Scientific Advisory Subcommittee, (4) prohibited acts, and (5) enforcement. Repeals the Eastern Pacific Tuna Licensing Act of 1984.
Title
Illegal, Unreported, and Unregulated Fishing Enforcement Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] |
Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] | Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 516. |
2014-12-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-685. |
2014-09-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-09-18 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2014-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-04-03 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2013-01-03 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E11) |
Same As/Similar To
SB269 (Related) 2013-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 263.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Commerce
Fishes
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Advisory bodies
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Commerce
Fishes
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection