US HB685 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Became Public Law No: 113-105.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Became Public Law No: 113-105.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
American Fighter Aces Congressional Gold Medal Act - Directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the presentation of a single congressional gold medal in honor of the American Fighter Aces, collectively, in recognition of their heroic military service and defense of the nation's freedom. Requires the medal to be given to the Smithsonian Institution for display and research purposes. Expresses the sense of Congress that the medal should be made available for display elsewhere, particularly at locations associated with the American Fighter Aces. Authorizes the Secretary of the Treasury to strike and sell bronze duplicates of the gold medal at a price sufficient to cover the costs of the medals.
Title
American Fighter Aces Congressional Gold Medal Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 381 N: 0 NV: 50 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-105. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3192) |
2014-05-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 0 (Roll no. 219). (text: CR H4456) |
2014-05-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4459-4460) |
2014-05-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-05-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 685. |
2014-05-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4456-4458) |
2014-05-19 | House | Mr. Huizenga (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1827 (Related) 2014-03-27 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Aviation and airports
Congressional tributes
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
Aviation and airports
Congressional tributes
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution