US HB674 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-31 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-93.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-31 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-93.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Rota Cultural and Natural Resources Study Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to: (1) study and report to Congress on the feasibility of designating prehistoric, historic, and limestone forest sites on the island of Rota, Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, as a unit of the National Park System; and (2) consider management alternatives for Rota.
Title
Rota Cultural and Natural Resources Study Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-93. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2013-06-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-06-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3663) |
2013-06-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 674. |
2013-06-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3663-3664) |
2013-06-17 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 48. |
2013-05-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-72. |
2013-04-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-04-24 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2013-02-13 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E133-134) |
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
Government studies and investigations
Northern Mariana Islands
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Government studies and investigations
Northern Mariana Islands
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources