US HB6328 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-271.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Clothe a Homeless Hero Act - Directs the Assistant Secretary of Homeland Security (Transportation Security Administration [TSA] ) to transfer unclaimed clothing recovered at airport security checkpoints to the local airport authority or other local authorities for donation to charity, including local veterans organizations or other local charitable organizations for distribution to homeless or needy veterans and their families. Authorizes the Assistant Secretary to enter into agreements with airport authorities for disposing of such clothing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clothe a Homeless Hero Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-14SenateBecame Public Law No: 112-271.
2013-01-14SenateSigned by President.
2013-01-03SenatePresented to President.
2013-01-01SenateMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2013-01-01SenateOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (consideraation: CR H7559; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR 12/30/2012 H7447)
2012-12-30SenateAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Bilirakis objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
2012-12-30SenateDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 6328.
2012-12-30SenateMr. Bilirakis moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H7446-7448)
2012-12-12SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2012-12-11SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7752)
2012-12-11SenateS.AMDT.3328 Amendment SA 3328 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2012-12-11SenateS.AMDT.3328 Amendment SA 3328 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Gillibrand. (consideration: CR S7752; text: CR S7752)To clarify that the clothing should be transferred to the local airport authority or other local authorities for donation to charity, including local veterans organizations or other local charitable organizations for distribution to homeless or needy veterans and veteran families.
2012-12-11SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7752)
2012-11-28SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2012-11-27HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2012-11-27HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6440)
2012-11-27HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6328.
2012-11-27HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6440-6441)
2012-11-27HouseMr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2012-09-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security.
2012-08-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.

Same As/Similar To

HB2179 (Related) 2012-05-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 328.
SB3640 (Related) 2012-11-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback