US HB5699 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-12 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-12 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act - Authorizes the Department of the Interior to acquire by donation approximately 44 acres of land to include in the John Muir National Historic Site in Martinez, California.
Title
John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act
Sponsors
Rep. George Miller [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 361 N: 39 NV: 34 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2014-12-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 361 - 39 (Roll no. 564). (text: CR 12/09/2014 H8880) |
2014-12-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9290-9291) |
2014-12-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5699. |
2014-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8880-8881) |
2014-12-09 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-12-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 490. |
2014-12-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-652. |
2014-11-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-11-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-11-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |