US HB569 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress

Status

Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2013-04-25 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to increase, as of December 1, 2013, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children. Requires each such increase to be the same percentage as the increase in benefits provided under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, on the same effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2013

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-25HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2013-04-25HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2013-04-16HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2013-02-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
2013-02-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB570 (Related) 2013-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB893 (Related) 2013-11-21 - Became Public Law No: 113-52.
HB4095 (Related) 2014-03-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
HB4096 (Related) 2014-03-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
SB2258 (Related) 2014-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-181.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback