US HB5338 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-31 - Referred to House Foreign Affairs
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-31 - Referred to House Foreign Affairs
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Employee Pension Fairness Act - Repeals provisions requiring federal employees, including foreign service employees, who began service after 2012 to pay an increased contribution (4.4%) for funding their annuities under the Federal Employees Retirement System (FERS). Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) treat certain foreign corporations managed and controlled primarily in the United States as domestic corporations for U.S. tax purposes; and (2) revise rules for the taxation of inverted corporations (i.e., U.S. corporations that acquire foreign companies to reincorporate in a foreign jurisdiction with lower income tax rates than the United States).
Title
Federal Employee Pension Fairness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] |
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2014-07-31 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2014-07-31 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2014-07-31 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3793 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB4679 (Related) 2014-05-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4985 (Related) 2014-06-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1844 (Related) 2013-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2360 (Related) 2014-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3188-31889)
HB4679 (Related) 2014-05-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4985 (Related) 2014-06-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1844 (Related) 2013-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2360 (Related) 2014-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3188-31889)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Corporate finance and management
Department of the Treasury
Foreign and international corporations
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Income tax rates
Taxation of foreign income
Corporate finance and management
Department of the Treasury
Foreign and international corporations
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Income tax rates
Taxation of foreign income
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5338/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5338/BILLS-113hr5338ih.pdf |