US HB5337 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress

Status

Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progress, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Animal Torture Prevention Act of 2010 - Amends the federal criminal code to impose a fine and/or prison term of up to five years for creating, selling, distributing, or offering to sell or distribute a depiction of extreme animal cruelty. Defines "depiction of extreme animal cruelty" as any visual depiction of actual conduct in which one or more animals is tortured, maimed, mutilated, or subjected to other acts of extreme animal cruelty, that appeals to the prurient interest, and that, taken as a whole, does not have more than de minimis religious, political, scientific, educational, journalistic, historical, or artistic value.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal Torture Prevention Act of 2010

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-26 Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2010-05-18 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

HB5092 (Related) 2010-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB5566 (Related) 2010-12-09 - Became Public Law No: 111-294.
SB3841 (Related) 2010-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback