US HB5160 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-1)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits any federal agency or instrumentality from using federal funding or resources to: (1) consider or adjudicate any new or previously denied application of any alien requesting consideration of deferred action for childhood arrivals, as authorized by Executive memorandum on August 15, 2012; or (2) authorize any alien to work in the United States who was not lawfully admitted into the United States and who is not in lawful status in the United States on the date of enactment of this Act.
Title
To prevent the expansion of the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals program unlawfully created by Executive memorandum on August 15, 2012.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2014-07-29 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6984-6985) |
2014-07-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2631 (Same As) 2014-07-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 473.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Border security and unlawful immigration
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Border security and unlawful immigration
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5160/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5160/BILLS-113hr5160ih.pdf |