US HB5069 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-264.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-264.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Duck Stamp Act of 2014 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Migratory Bird Hunting and Conservation Stamp Act to increase the price of duck stamps, which are required to hunt migratory waterfowl, from $15 to $25. Authorizes the Department of the Interior to reduce the price of stamps for a hunting year if the increase in the stamp price resulted in a reduction in revenues deposited in the Migratory Bird Conservation Fund. Establishes a subaccount in the Fund to be used by Interior to acquire easements for the conservation of migratory birds. Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to transfer all amounts in excess of $15 from the sale of each stamp to the subaccount. (Sec. 3) Requires Interior to include in an annual report of the Migratory Bird Conservation Commission an assessment of the status of wetlands conservation projects for migratory bird conservation purposes, including an accounting of all expenditures made for acquisition of federal lands and an analysis of whether refuge lands are opened or closed for hunting and fishing. (Sec. 4) Allows rural Alaska residents to take migratory waterfowl for subsistence uses without a duck stamp.
Title
Federal Duck Stamp Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Rep. John Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Vance McAllister [R-LA] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] |
Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-264. |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6246-6248) |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2014-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8002) |
2014-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5069. |
2014-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8002-8003) |
2014-11-17 | House | Mr. Fleming moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-11-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 463. |
2014-11-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-622. |
2014-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-30 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2014-07-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2014-07-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2014-07-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2621 (Same As) 2014-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Animals
Birds
Congressional oversight
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Birds
Congressional oversight
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection