US HB5051 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 162-1)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Women's Health From Corporate Interference Act of 2014 - Affirms requirements, notwithstanding the Religious Freedom Restoration Act of 1993, that: (1) an employer that establishes or maintains a group health plan for its employees must provide coverage of a specific item or service for the employees or their dependents where the coverage is required under federal provisions or regulations pursuant to those provisions; and (2) group health plans sponsored by an employer or employee organization, and any health insurance coverage, must provide coverage required under the Public Health Service Act, including preventive health services. Authorizes the Departments of Labor, Health and Human Services (HHS), and the Treasury to modify regulations concerning coverage of contraceptive services by group health plans of religious employers consistent with the purposes and findings (regarding coverage of birth control services and the Supreme Court decisions in Burwell v. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. and Conestoga Wood Specialties Corp. v. Burwell) of this Act.
Title
Protect Women's Health From Corporate Interference Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2014-07-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-07-09 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2014-07-09 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2014-07-09 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2014-07-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2578 (Related) 2014-07-16 - Motion by Senator Reid to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to the measure (Record Vote No. 228) entered in Senate. (consideration: CR S4535)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Comprehensive health care
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Labor
Department of the Treasury
Employee benefits and pensions
Family planning and birth control
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Religion
Women's health
Comprehensive health care
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Labor
Department of the Treasury
Employee benefits and pensions
Family planning and birth control
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Religion
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5051/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5051/BILLS-113hr5051ih.pdf |