US HB4854 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 453.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 453.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulatory Certainty Act of 2014 - Amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to limit the period during which the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) may prohibit the specification, or restrict the use, of an area as a disposal site for discharges of dredged or fill materials into waters of the United States to the period that: begins on the date that the Army Corps of Engineers provides notice to the EPA that the Corps has completed all procedures for processing an application for a permit for dredged or fill material and is ready to determine whether the permit should be issued; and ends on the date that the Corps issues the permit. Requires the Corps to ensure that the period consists of at least 30 consecutive days. Authorizes the Corps to issue a permit for dredged or fill material only after the Corps provides notice to the EPA.
Title
Regulatory Certainty Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Tim Huelskamp [R-KS] | Rep. David Jolly [R-FL] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] |
Rep. Nick Rahall [D-WV] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Steve Southerland [R-FL] |
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 453. |
2014-11-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-609. |
2014-07-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 22. |
2014-07-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-16 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2014-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Defense
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Licensing and registrations
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Department of Defense
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Licensing and registrations
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality