US HB4834 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Generating Renewal, Opportunity, and Work with Accelerated Mobility, Efficiency, and Rebuilding of Infrastructure and Communities throughout America Act
Title
Generating Renewal, Opportunity, and Work with Accelerated Mobility, Efficiency, and Rebuilding of Infrastructure and Communities throughout America Act
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Petri [R-WI] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2014-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power. |
2014-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2014-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2014-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2014-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade. |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2014-06-11 | House | Referred to House Rules |
2014-06-11 | House | Referred to House Budget |
2014-06-11 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2014-06-11 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2014-06-11 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2014-06-11 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2014-06-11 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2014-06-11 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2014-06-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Oversight and Government Reform, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5467 (Related) 2014-09-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB5591 (Related) 2014-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB5624 (Related) 2014-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB5591 (Related) 2014-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB5624 (Related) 2014-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Appropriations
Bankruptcy
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Budget deficits and national debt
Business records
Buy American requirements
Census and government statistics
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Department of Transportation
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Fishes
General public lands matters
Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Higher education
Historic sites and heritage areas
Hunting and fishing
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax exclusion
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Infrastructure development
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial review and appeals
Labor standards
Latin America
Libraries and archives
Licensing and registrations
Life, casualty, property insurance
Marine and inland water transportation
Mexico
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Motor carriers
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak)
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Noise pollution
Performance measurement
Product safety and quality
Public contracts and procurement
Public participation and lobbying
Public transit
Railroads
Regional and metropolitan planning
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Sales and excise taxes
Securities
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Travel and tourism
Urban and suburban affairs and development
User charges and fees
Wages and earnings
Water quality
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Appropriations
Bankruptcy
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Budget deficits and national debt
Business records
Buy American requirements
Census and government statistics
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Department of Transportation
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Fishes
General public lands matters
Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Higher education
Historic sites and heritage areas
Hunting and fishing
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax exclusion
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Infrastructure development
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial review and appeals
Labor standards
Latin America
Libraries and archives
Licensing and registrations
Life, casualty, property insurance
Marine and inland water transportation
Mexico
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Motor carriers
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak)
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Noise pollution
Performance measurement
Product safety and quality
Public contracts and procurement
Public participation and lobbying
Public transit
Railroads
Regional and metropolitan planning
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Sales and excise taxes
Securities
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Travel and tourism
Urban and suburban affairs and development
User charges and fees
Wages and earnings
Water quality
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4834/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4834/BILLS-113hr4834ih.pdf |