US HB4811 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 35 - 24.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 35 - 24.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bureau Guidance Transparency Act - Amends the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 to direct the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB), when issuing guidance, to: (1) provide for a public notice and comment period before issuing the guidance in final form, (2) make publicly available all information relied on by the CFPB, and (3) redact any information that is exempt from disclosure under specified provisions of the Freedom of Information Act. Declares without force or effect CFPB Bulletin 2013-02 (Indirect Auto Lending and Compliance with the Equal Credit Opportunity Act), published March 21, 2013.
Title
Bureau Guidance Transparency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Marlin Stutzman [R-IN] | Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. John Campbell [R-CA] |
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Tim Huelskamp [R-KS] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] |
Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 35 - 24. |
2014-06-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-06-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2014-05-21 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5403 (Related) 2014-09-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government information and archives
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government information and archives
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4811/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4811/BILLS-113hr4811ih.pdf |