US HB4808 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Coal Country Protection Act or the Protecting Jobs, Families, and the Economy From EPA Overreach Act - Amends the Clean Air Act to prohibit the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) from promulgating any regulation or guidance that limits or prohibits new carbon dioxide emissions from a fossil fuel-fired power plant until it is certified: (1) by the Secretary of Labor that the regulation or guidance will not generate a loss of employment, (2) by the Director of the Congressional Budget Office (CBO) that it will not result in a loss in the gross domestic product, (3) by the Administrator of the Energy Information Administration that it will not generate an increase in electricity rates, and (4) by the Chairperson of the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC) and the President of the North American Electric Reliability Corporation that it will not effect the reliability of electricity delivery.
Title
Coal Country Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] |
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] |
Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Alan Nunnelee [R-MS] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] |
Rep. Nick Rahall [D-WV] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] | Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY] |
Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] |
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2014-06-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2414 (Same As) 2014-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3369)
HB4850 (Related) 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
HB4850 (Related) 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Economic performance and conditions
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy prices
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Oil and gas
Public utilities and utility rates
Unemployment
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Economic performance and conditions
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy prices
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Oil and gas
Public utilities and utility rates
Unemployment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4808/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4808/BILLS-113hr4808ih.pdf |