US HB4789 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent the taxpayer election to deduct state and local general sales taxes in lieu of state and local income taxes.
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make the deduction for State and local general sales taxes permanent.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Fincher [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2014-05-30 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E884) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2854 (Related) 2013-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3942 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB41 (Related) 2013-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB127 (Related) 2013-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1859 (Related) 2013-12-20 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 287.
SB2260 (Related) 2014-05-07 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S2763-2768)
HB3942 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB41 (Related) 2013-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB127 (Related) 2013-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1859 (Related) 2013-12-20 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 287.
SB2260 (Related) 2014-05-07 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S2763-2768)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4789/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4789/BILLS-113hr4789ih.pdf |