US HB4709 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring Patient Access and Effective Drug Enforcement Act of 2014 - Amends the Controlled Substances Act to define: (1) "factors as may be relevant to and consistent with the public health and safety," for purposes of the Attorney General's determination of whether registering an applicant to manufacture or distribute a controlled substance in schedule I or II is in the public interest, as factors that are relevant to and consistent with the findings of such Act; and (2) "imminent danger to the public health or safety," for purposes of the suspension of such a registration, to mean that in the absence of an immediate suspension order, controlled substances will continue to be intentionally diverted outside of legitimate distribution channels or distributed or dispensed outside the usual course of professional practices or in a manner that poses a present or foreseeable risk of serious adverse health consequences or death. Requires an order to show cause as to why such a registration should not be denied, revoked, or suspended to: (1) contain a statement of the basis for the denial, revocation, or suspension, including specific citations to any laws or regulations alleged to be violated; (2) direct the applicant or registrant to appear before the Attorney General at a specific place and time within 30 days after receipt of the order; and (3) notify the applicant or registrant of the opportunity to submit a corrective action plan on or before such appearance. Requires the Attorney General, upon review of any such plan, to determine whether denial, revocation, or suspension proceedings should be discontinued or deferred for purposes of modifications to such plan. Makes such requirements inapplicable to the issuance of an immediate suspension order. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS), acting through the Commissioner of Food and Drugs (FDA) and the Director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC), to submit a report identifying: (1) obstacles to legitimate patient access to controlled substances; (2) issues with diversion of controlled substances; and (3) how collaboration between federal, state, local, and tribal law enforcement agencies and the pharmaceutical industry can benefit patients and prevent diversion and abuse of controlled substances.
Title
Ensuring Patient Access and Effective Drug Enforcement Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. George Holding [R-NC] |
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2014-07-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7004-7005) |
2014-07-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4709. |
2014-07-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7004-7007) |
2014-07-29 | House | Mr. Pitts moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-07-29 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-605, Part I. |
2014-07-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2014-06-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-06-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4069 (Related) 2014-04-07 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB2862 (Related) 2014-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2862 (Related) 2014-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Licensing and registrations
Prescription drugs
Retail and wholesale trades
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Licensing and registrations
Prescription drugs
Retail and wholesale trades