US HB4701 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tick-Borne Disease Research Accountability and Transparency Act of 2014 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to conduct or support epidemiological, basic, translational, and clinical research regarding Lyme disease and other tick-borne diseases. Directs the Secretary to establish the Interagency Lyme and Tick-Borne Disease Working Group to review all HHS efforts concerning tick-borne diseases to ensure interagency coordination and examine research priorities. Requires the Working Group to: (1) provide a summary of tick-borne disease research, advances, and scientific viewpoints every two years; (2) make recommendations to HHS regarding tick-borne disease activities; and (3) hold annual public meetings.Requires HHS to submit a strategic plan for tick-borne disease research within three years of enactment and every five years thereafter that includes: (1) budgetary requirements; (2) benchmarks for improving tick-borne disease diagnosis, treatment, outcomes, and prevention; and (3) a plan to disseminate Working Group summaries and other relevant information on tick-borne disease to health professionals and the public.
Title
Tick-Borne Disease Research Accountability and Transparency Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. John Barrow [D-GA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
Rep. Daniel Maffei [D-NY] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2014-09-09 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2014-09-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-09-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7344-7345) |
2014-09-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4701. |
2014-09-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7344-7347) |
2014-09-09 | House | Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-09-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 424. |
2014-09-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-573. |
2014-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-06-19 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Unanimous Consent . |
2014-06-19 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical research
Research administration and funding
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical research
Research administration and funding