US HB4668 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-19 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-19 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Point Spencer Coast Guard and Public-Private Sector Infrastructure Development Facilitation and Land Conveyance Act - Designates certain land at Point Spencer in Alaska (a parcel of land on which a decommissioned long range radio navigation station was located) to be: (1) retained by the Coast Guard; (2) conveyed to, or leased by, the state of Alaska; and (3) conveyed to the Bering Straits Native Corporation (BSNC) (a corporation authorized to represent and manage land and resources from the settlement of aboriginal claims of indigenous Alaska Natives in the Bering Strait region). Requires the Secretary of the department in which the Coast Guard is operating to retain an easement authorizing public aircraft to use all existing and future airstrips, runways, and taxiways on a specified tract of such land at no cost. Defines "public aircraft" as any aircraft owned by, operated by, or chartered by the United States or by a contractor of the United States for the performance of a federal contract on or from Point Spencer. Sets forth requirements concerning: (1) conveyed lands that are leased back to the Coast Guard upon the Secretary's request, (2) airspace easements, and (3) rights-of-way on roads to and from airstrips. Requires the United States to retain the authority to enforce archaeological and historic preservation laws on certain land. Directs the Secretary, the state of Alaska, and the BSNC to develop a joint management plan for the use and management of the lands retained, conveyed, or leased under this Act.
Title
Point Spencer Coast Guard and Public-Private Sector Infrastructure Development Facilitation and Land Conveyance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-11-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-11-19 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2014-11-19 | House | Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2014-09-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2014-05-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2014-05-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2014-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2014-05-15 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E756-757) |
Subjects
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Aviation and airports
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Military facilities and property
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Aviation and airports
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Military facilities and property
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4668/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4668/BILLS-113hr4668ih.pdf |