US HB4641 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Erie Canalway National Heritage Corridor Act to extend the Erie Canalway National Heritage Corridor Commission until 30 years (currently, 15 years) after December 21, 2000.
Title
To reauthorize the Erie Canalway National Heritage Corridor Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] |
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Daniel Maffei [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. William Owens [D-NY] |
Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2014-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2318 (Same As) 2014-07-23 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Dams and canals
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Historic sites and heritage areas
New York State
Public lands and natural resources
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Historic sites and heritage areas
New York State
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4641/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4641/BILLS-113hr4641ih.pdf |