US HB4619 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 369.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 369.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanent IRA Charitable Contribution Act of 2014 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent the exclusion from gross income of distributions from individual retirement accounts (IRAs) for charitable purposes.
Title
Permanent IRA Charitable Contribution Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] |
Rep. Tom Price [R-GA] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 369. |
2014-06-26 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 113-496. |
2014-05-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 14. |
2014-05-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1772 (Related) 2013-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Charitable contributions
Employee benefits and pensions
Income tax exclusion
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Employee benefits and pensions
Income tax exclusion
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations