US HB4497 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to tax relief for federally-declared disasters, to: (1) allow the expensing of qualified disaster expenses (i.e., for removal of debris, demolition, and repair of business-related property) for a disaster occurring during September 2013; (2) allow individual taxpayers an increased tax deduction for charitable contributions made for relief efforts related to a federally-declared disaster which occurs after August 31, 2013, if such contributions are made by December 31, 2014; and (3) allow corporations an increased tax deduction for disaster-related charitable contributions.
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide tax relief for damages relating to federally declared disasters during September 2013, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2233 (Related) 2014-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5082 (Related) 2014-07-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2634 (Related) 2014-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5082 (Related) 2014-07-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2634 (Related) 2014-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Business expenses
Charitable contributions
Disaster relief and insurance
Income tax deductions
Natural disasters
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Taxation
Charitable contributions
Disaster relief and insurance
Income tax deductions
Natural disasters
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4497/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4497/BILLS-113hr4497ih.pdf |