US HB4469 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cut Taxes for the Middle Class Act of 2014 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through 2014: (1) the tax deduction for state and local general sales taxes in lieu of state and local income taxes, (2) the tax deduction for qualified tuition and related expenses, (3) the tax deduction for expenses of elementary and secondary school teachers, (4) the tax credit for differential wage payments to employees who are active duty members of the Uniformed Services, (5) the work opportunity tax credit, (6) the new markets tax credit, and (7) the tax credit for increasing research activities. Amends the Housing Assistance Tax Act of 2008 to extend through 2014 the exemption of the basic military housing allowance from the income test for programs financed by tax-exempt housing bonds.
Title
Cut Taxes for the Middle Class Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3943 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3945 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3946 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3947 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1859 (Related) 2013-12-20 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 287.
SB2260 (Related) 2014-05-07 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S2763-2768)
HB3945 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3946 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3947 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1859 (Related) 2013-12-20 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 287.
SB2260 (Related) 2014-05-07 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S2763-2768)
Subjects
Elementary and secondary education
Financial services and investments
Higher education
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Low- and moderate-income housing
Military personnel and dependents
Research and development
Rural conditions and development
Sales and excise taxes
Securities
State and local taxation
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
Financial services and investments
Higher education
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Low- and moderate-income housing
Military personnel and dependents
Research and development
Rural conditions and development
Sales and excise taxes
Securities
State and local taxation
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4469/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4469/BILLS-113hr4469ih.pdf |