US HB4461 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Climate Change Education Act - Declares that the evidence for human-induced climate change is overwhelming and undeniable. Requires the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to establish a Climate Change Education Program to: broaden the understanding of human-induced climate change, possible consequences, and potential solutions; apply the latest scientific and technological discoveries to provide learning opportunities to people of all ages; conduct a national information campaign to help people understand and promote implementation of new technologies, programs, and incentives related to energy conservation, renewable energy, and greenhouse gas reduction; and inform the public of impacts to human health and safety as a result of climate change. Directs NOAA to establish a grant program to support climate change education.
Title
Climate Change Education Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2014-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2014-04-28 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3223) |
2014-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Government information and archives
Higher education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Vocational and technical education
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Government information and archives
Higher education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4461/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4461/BILLS-113hr4461ih.pdf |