US HB4459 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Democracy Restoration Act of 2014 - Declares that the right of a U.S. citizen to vote in any election for federal office shall not be denied or abridged because that individual has been convicted of a criminal offense unless, at the time of the election, such individual is serving a felony sentence in a correctional institution or facility. Provides for enforcement of, and remedies for violations of, this Act. Sets forth requirements for state and federal notification of individuals of the restoration of their voting rights pursuant to this Act. Prohibits any state, local government, or other person from receiving or using any federal grant amounts to construct or improve a place of incarceration unless that person has in effect a program to notify each U.S. citizen incarcerated in that person's jurisdiction, upon release from such incarceration, of that individual's rights under this Act. Prohibits this Act from being construed to prohibit a state from enacting any state law that affords the right to vote in any election for federal office on terms less restrictive than those terms established by this Act. Declares that the rights and remedies established by this Act shall be in addition to all other rights and remedies provided by law and shall not supersede, restrict, or limit the application of the Voting Rights Act of 1965 or the National Voter Registration Act of 1993.
Title
Democracy Restoration Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] |
Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. James Moran [D-VA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2235 (Related) 2014-12-09 - Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights and Human Rights. Hearings held.
SB2550 (Related) 2014-06-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5719 (Related) 2014-12-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SB2550 (Related) 2014-06-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5719 (Related) 2014-12-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Law enforcement administration and funding
Voting rights
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Law enforcement administration and funding
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4459/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4459/BILLS-113hr4459ih.pdf |