US HB4367 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Internet Stewardship Act of 2014 - Prohibits the Assistant Secretary of Commerce for Communications and Information from relinquishing or agreeing to relinquish the responsibilities of the National Telecommunications and Information Administration (NTIA) with respect to Internet domain name functions (including the authoritative root zone file, the Internet Assigned Numbers Authority functions, or the related root zone management functions) unless such relinquishment is permitted by a statute enacted after the enactment of this Act.
Title
Internet Stewardship Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] |
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4342 (Related) 2014-12-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 546.
HB4398 (Related) 2014-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB4398 (Related) 2014-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Executive agency funding and structure
Internet and video services
Department of Commerce
Executive agency funding and structure
Internet and video services
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4367/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4367/BILLS-113hr4367ih.pdf |