US HB4349 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crude Oil Export Act - Amends the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to repeal the authority of the President to restrict exports of: (1) coal, petroleum products, natural gas, or petrochemical feedstocks, and (2) materials or equipment which he determines necessary for either exploration, production, refining, or transportation of energy supplies, or for construction or maintenance of energy facilities within the United States. Amends the Mineral Leasing Act to repeal limitations on exports of oil. Amends the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act to repeal limitations on export of Outer Continental Shelf oil or gas on the lands within its purview. Declares without force or effect: (1) the limitation placed upon crude oil exports by the Export Administration Act of 1979, and (2) a specified regulation relating to crude oil. Directs the Bureau of Industry and Security of the Department of Commerce to grant licenses to export crude oil to a country unless: (1) the country is subject to sanctions or trade restrictions imposed by the United States, or (2) either the President or Congress has designated the country as subject to exclusion for reasons of national security. Authorizes the President, subject to a congressional resolution of disapproval, to ban the export of crude oil from the United States for a maximum period of 90 days during a national emergency. Permits renewal of such ban during periods of national emergency. Subjects any act of imposing or renewing a ban to a resolution of disapproval under the Congressional Review Act.
Title
Crude Oil Export Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Jim Bridenstine [R-OK] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] |
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade. |
2014-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2014-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to House Rules |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Energy and Commerce, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4286 (Related) 2014-04-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SB2170 (Related) 2014-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2170 (Related) 2014-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4349/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4349/BILLS-113hr4349ih.pdf |