US HB4323 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Became Public Law No: 113-182.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Became Public Law No: 113-182.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Debbie Smith Reauthorization Act of 2014 - Amends the Debbie Smith Act of 2004 to reauthorize funding through FY2019 for: (1) the Debbie Smith DNA Backlog Grant Program; (2) DNA training and education for law enforcement, correctional personnel, and court officers; and (3) sexual assault forensic exam program grants.
Title
Debbie Smith Reauthorization Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Joe Garcia [D-FL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] |
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-182. |
2014-09-29 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-09-29 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5763) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2014-04-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2980) |
2014-04-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4323. |
2014-04-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2980-2983) |
2014-04-07 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 298. |
2014-04-07 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-404. |
2014-04-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2014-04-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-03-31 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations Discharged. |
2014-03-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Evidence and witnesses
Genetics
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex offenses
Violent crime
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Evidence and witnesses
Genetics
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex offenses
Violent crime