US HB4257 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rebalance for an Effective Defense Uniform and Civilian Employees Act (REDUCE Act) - Limits full-time positions in the Department of Defense (DOD), in each of FY2021-FY2025, subject to specified adjustments to be made by the DOD Secretary, to a number not greater than 85% of the number of such positions at DOD as of September 30, 2015. Permits not more than 1,000 of such positions to be career appointees within the Senior Executive Service. Authorizes the DOD Secretary to offer voluntary separation incentive payments and voluntary early retirement payments to achieve the reductions required by this Act, but requires the Secretary to use involuntary measures, including reductions in force, beginning on October 1, 2015, to achieve required reductions in personnel levels if voluntary measures are inadequate.
Title
Rebalance for an Effective Defense Uniform and Civilian Employees Act (REDUCE Act)
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] |
Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] |
Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Paul Ryan [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2014-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4257/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4257/BILLS-113hr4257ih.pdf |