US HB4253 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 503.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 503.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bureau of Land Management Withdrawn Military Lands Efficiency and Savings Act - Amends the Military Lands Withdrawal Act of 1999 to declare that the withdrawal and reservation of certain lands and interests concerning the Naval Air Station Fallon Ranges and the Nellis Air Force Range in Nevada, the Fort Greely East and West Training Ranges and the Yukon Training Range of Fort Wainright in Alaska, and the McGregor Range of Fort Bliss in New Mexico shall not terminate except by an election and a determination of the Secretary of the military department concerned or until the Secretary of the Interior can permanently transfer administrative jurisdiction of the withdrawn and reserved lands to that Secretary. (Currently the withdrawal and reservation of such lands must terminate, except in certain circumstances, 25 years after November 6, 2001.)
Title
Bureau of Land Management Withdrawn Military Lands Efficiency and Savings Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 503. |
2014-12-12 | House | Committee on Armed Services discharged. |
2014-12-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-671, Part I. |
2014-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2014-04-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 10. |
2014-04-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-04-09 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2014-03-25 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2014-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2014-03-14 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2014-03-14 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2014-03-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Alaska
Land transfers
Military facilities and property
Nevada
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources
Land transfers
Military facilities and property
Nevada
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources