US HB4220 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 528.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 528.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School District 318 Land Exchange Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to: (1) accept any offer by the Minnesota Independent School District number 318 in Grand Rapids, Minnesota, to convey to the United States approximately 1.6 acres of specified non-federal land (including any structures on it), and (2) convey to the District in exchange approximately 1.3 acres of specified U.S. Geological Survey land.
Title
School District 318 Land Exchange Act
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 528. |
2014-12-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-697. |
2014-11-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-11-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-11-19 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2014-11-19 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2014-03-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2014-03-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2123 (Same As) 2014-07-30 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-433.
HB3979 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-291.
HB3979 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-291.