US HB4177 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the tax treatment of payments to a Medicare Advantage Medical Savings Account (MSA), to eliminate the restriction on contributions or transfers to such accounts (currently, only a contribution made by the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) pursuant to Medicare Advantage or a trustee-to-trustee transfer is permitted).
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow Medicare beneficiaries participating in a Medicare Advantage MSA to contribute their own money to their MSA.
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2194 (Related) 2013-06-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3121 (Related) 2014-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1031 (Related) 2013-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3121 (Related) 2014-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1031 (Related) 2013-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4177/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4177/BILLS-113hr4177ih.pdf |