US HB4164 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 51 - 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 51 - 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Company Disclosure Simplification Act - Exempts emerging growth companies and issuers with total annual gross revenues of less than $250 million from the requirements to use Extensible Business Reporting Language (XBRL) for financial statements and other mandatory periodic reporting filed with the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC). Allows such companies, however, to elect to use XBRL for such reporting. Directs the SEC to: (1) analyze the costs and benefits to such issuers of the requirements to use XBRL for financial statements and other mandatory periodic reporting; and (2) report to certain congressional committees on the results of such analysis as well as on progress in implementing XBRL reporting within the SEC, and use of XBRL data by the SEC and by investors.
Title
Small Company Disclosure Simplification Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Hurt [R-VA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 51 - 5. |
2014-03-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2013-10-23 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5405 (Related) 2014-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Business investment and capital
Business records
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government studies and investigations
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Small business
Business investment and capital
Business records
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government studies and investigations
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4164/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4164/BILLS-113hr4164ih.pdf |