US HB4158 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 103-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Special Inspector General for Monitoring the ACA Act of 2014 or the SIGMA Act of 2014 - Establishes the Office of the Special Inspector General for Monitoring the Affordable Care Act to conduct, supervise, and coordinate audits and investigations of the implementation and administration of programs and activities established under, and payment system changes made by, the Affordable Care Act (the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the health care provisions of the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010). Requires the Special Inspector General to be appointed by the President, with the advice and consent of the Senate. Requires the Special Inspector General to appoint an Assistant Inspector General for Auditing and an Assistant Inspector General for Investigations. Places the Special Inspector General under the supervision of the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS), but prohibits federal agencies involved in implementing or administering the Affordable Care Act from preventing or prohibiting the Special Inspector General from initiating, carrying out, or completing any audit or investigation.
Title
SIGMA Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to House Appropriations |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to House Rules |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, Oversight and Government Reform, House Administration, the Judiciary, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2430 (Same As) 2014-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Abortion
Accounting and auditing
Comprehensive health care
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Income tax credits
Medicaid
Performance measurement
Religion
Sales and excise taxes
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Accounting and auditing
Comprehensive health care
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Income tax credits
Medicaid
Performance measurement
Religion
Sales and excise taxes
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4158/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4158/BILLS-113hr4158ih.pdf |