US HB4149 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Help Hire our Heroes Act - Amends the VOW to Hire Heroes Act of 2011 to extend through September 30, 2014, the veterans retraining assistance program. Amends the Internal Revenue Code to transfer funds for such program from the Leaking Underground Storage Tank Trust Fund.
Title
Help Hire our Heroes Act
Sponsors
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Pete Gallego [D-TX] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] |
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. Gloria Negrete McLeod [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy. |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Appropriations
Department of Veterans Affairs
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Oil and gas
Pollution liability
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Water quality
Department of Veterans Affairs
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Oil and gas
Pollution liability
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Water quality
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4149/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4149/BILLS-113hr4149ih.pdf |