US HB4092 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act of 2014 - Amends the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to direct the Secretary of Energy (DOE), acting through the Office of Energy and Renewable Energy, to establish a clearinghouse to disseminate information regarding available programs and financing mechanisms that may be used to help initiate, develop, and finance energy efficiency, distributed generation, and energy retrofitting projects for schools. Requires the Secretary to: (1) consult with appropriate agencies to develop a list of programs and financing mechanisms that are, or may be, used for the projects, and (2) coordinate with appropriate agencies to develop a collaborative education and outreach effort to streamline communications and promote the programs and financing mechanisms.
Title
Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2014-06-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5604) |
2014-06-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4092. |
2014-06-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5604-5605) |
2014-06-23 | House | Mr. Kinzinger (IL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 355. |
2014-06-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-479. |
2014-04-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-04-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-04-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-02-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1084 (Related) 2013-06-25 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-70.
SB2074 (Related) 2014-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2074 (Related) 2014-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Building construction
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government information and archives
Higher education
Building construction
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government information and archives
Higher education