US HB4067 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress

Status

Status: Engrossed on September 10 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-09-10 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS), to continue to apply through calendar year 2014 the enforcement instruction on physician supervision requirements for outpatient therapeutic services in critical access and small rural hospitals, as extended in November 2012 for calendar year 2013 by the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services. (The instruction directs Medicare contractors not to evaluate or enforce such requirements until the policy on supervision of such services could be revisited.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide for the extension of the enforcement instruction on supervision requirements for outpatient therapeutic services in critical access and small rural hospitals through 2014.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-10SenateReceived in the Senate.
2014-09-09HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2014-09-09HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7339)
2014-09-09HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4067.
2014-09-09HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7339-7341)
2014-09-09HouseMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2014-09-09HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 431.
2014-09-09HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
2014-09-09HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-582, Part I.
2014-07-30HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 11.
2014-07-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2014-07-29HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2014-07-28HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2014-02-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2014-02-18HouseReferred to House Ways and Means
2014-02-18HouseReferred to House Energy and Commerce
2014-02-18HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Same As/Similar To

SB1954 (Same As) 2014-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2359 (Related) 2014-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback