US HB4032 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Became Public Law No: 113-117.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Became Public Law No: 113-117.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
North Texas Invasive Species Barrier Act of 2014 - Exempts certain water transfers by the North Texas Municipal Water District and the Greater Texoma Utility Authority from prohibitions on the transfer of invasive species across state borders proscribed under the Lacey Act Amendments of 1981 and related criminal code provisions if: (1) only closed systems from Lake Texoma are used in the transfer, and (2) invasive species are eliminated or removed at treatment facilities.
Title
North Texas Invasive Species Barrier Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Hall [R-TX] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-117. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3308) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2014-04-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3216) |
2014-04-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4032. |
2014-04-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3216-3217) |
2014-04-28 | House | Mr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-04-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 304. |
2014-04-10 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2014-04-10 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-413, Part I. |
2014-04-08 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations Discharged. |
2014-03-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-03-13 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2014-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Texas
Water resources development
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Texas
Water resources development
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection