US HB4016 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Quality Foster Care Services Act of 2014 - Amends title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act (SSA) to extend medical assistance coverage to therapeutic foster care services. Requires a qualified therapeutic foster care program to be state-licensed and provide: (1) foster care children under 21 with structured daily activities, including the development of age-appropriate social, communication and behavioral skills, trauma-informed and gender-responsive services, crisis intervention and crisis support services, medication monitoring, counseling, and case management; and (2) foster care parents with specialized training and consultation in the management of children with mental illness, trauma, other emotional or behavioral disorders, medically fragile conditions, or developmental disabilities, and specific additional training on the needs of each child provided such services.
Title
Quality Foster Care Services Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] |
Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1992 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5364 (Related) 2014-08-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5364 (Related) 2014-08-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Child care and development
Child health
Disability and paralysis
Health
Medicaid
Mental health
Child care and development
Child health
Disability and paralysis
Health
Medicaid
Mental health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4016/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4016/BILLS-113hr4016ih.pdf |