US HB3994 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-09 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-09 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Lands Invasive Species Control, Prevention, and Management Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior (respecting federal lands administered through the Bureau of Indian Affairs [BIA], Bureau of Land Management [BLM], Bureau of Reclamation, National Park Service, or U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service) and the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) (respecting federal lands administered through the U.S. Forest Service) to plan and carry out activities on lands directly managed by the Secretary concerned to control and manage invasive species in order to inhibit or reduce their populations and to effectuate restoration or reclamation efforts. Requires the Secretary concerned to develop a strategic plan for the implementation of an invasive species program that endeavors to achieve an annual 5% net reduction of invasive species populations on lands managed by that Secretary. Requires the Secretary concerned to use: (1) no less than 75% of funds each fiscal year for on-the-ground control and management of invasive species; (2) no more than 15% of such funds for investigations, development activities, and outreach and public awareness efforts to address invasive species control and management needs; and (3) no more than 10% for administrative costs. Requires the Secretaries, in selecting the method or methods to control or manage an invasive species as part of a specific control or management project, to require the use of the least costly options necessary to perform effectively, based on sound scientific data and other commonly used cost-effective benchmarks in the area.
Title
Federal Lands Invasive Species Control, Prevention, and Management Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry. |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power. |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Animal and plant health
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
General public lands matters
Intergovernmental relations
Pest management
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
State and local government operations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
General public lands matters
Intergovernmental relations
Pest management
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
State and local government operations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3994/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3994/BILLS-113hr3994ih.pdf |