US HB3930 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 153-66-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Commission on the Structure of the Army Act of 2014 - Establishes the National Commission on the Structure of the Army to undertake a comprehensive study of the structure of the Army to determine: (1) the proper force mixture of the active component and reserve component, and (2) how the structure should be modified to best fulfill mission requirements in a manner consistent with available resources. Directs the Commission to give particular consideration to evaluating a structure that: (1) meets current and anticipated requirements of the combatant commands; (3) achieves a cost-efficiency balance between the regular and reserve components, with a focus on fully burdened and lifecycle cost of Army personnel; (3) ensures that the regular and reserve components have the capacity needed to support homeland defense and disaster assistance missions in the United States; (4) provides for sufficient numbers of regular members of the Army to provide a base of trained personnel from which the personnel of the reserve components could be recruited; (5) maintains a peacetime rotation force to support operational tempo goals of 1:2 for regular members and 1:5 for members of the reserve components; and (6) maximizes and appropriately balances affordability, efficiency, effectiveness, capability, and readiness. Prohibits the use of any funds made available for FY2015 for the Army to: (1) divest, retire, or transfer, or prepare to divest, retire, or transfer, any aircraft of the Army assigned to units of the Army National Guard as of January 15, 2014; or (2) reduce personnel below the authorized end strength levels of 350,000 for the Army National Guard as of September 30, 2014.
Title
National Commission on the Structure of the Army Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2295 (Related) 2014-05-07 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2785-2786)
SB2410 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 402.
SB2410 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 402.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Disaster relief and insurance
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Military civil functions
Military command and structure
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Military readiness
National Guard and reserves
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Disaster relief and insurance
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Military civil functions
Military command and structure
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Military readiness
National Guard and reserves
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3930/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3930/BILLS-113hr3930ih.pdf |