US HB3893 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Responsible Rail and Deterring Deficiency Act - Declares that the Congress determines that a certain California high-speed train project would not be adequately served by continuation of federal assistance. Directs the Federal Railroad Administration (FRA), based upon that determination, to exercise its right under the grant agreement (entered into between the FRA and the California High Speed Rail Authority numbered FR-HSR-0009-10-01-05 on December 5, 2012) to suspend any further financial assistance for the project until: (1) the California High Speed Rail Authority certifies to the FRA that it has access to state funds, or other non-federal funds, in the amounts specified in the grant agreement and such funds are available to meet the Authority's financial obligations under that agreement; or (2) September 30, 2017. Prohibits the FRA from amending, supplementing, or otherwise changing the terms of the grant agreement until the requirements for suspension of federal assistance have been met.
Title
Responsible Rail and Deterring Deficiency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. John Campbell [R-CA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R-CA] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Howard McKeon [R-CA] | Rep. Gary Miller [R-CA] | Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] |
Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Subjects
California
Intergovernmental relations
Railroads
State and local finance
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Intergovernmental relations
Railroads
State and local finance
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3893/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3893/BILLS-113hr3893ih.pdf |