US HB3837 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vested Employee Pension Benefit Protection Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow employees in the building and construction industry to make distributions from their tax-exempt multi-employer pension plan at age 55 if they are not separated from employment at the time of such distributions and were participants in such plan on or before April 30, 2013, and the plan provides for payment of separate accrued benefits when the employee attains the plan's normal retirement age. Suspends payment of distributions for such building and construction industry employees if their multi-employer plan is in endangered or critical status.
Title
Vested Employee Pension Benefit Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. William Enyart [D-IL] |
Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB838 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3837/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3837/BILLS-113hr3837ih.pdf |