US HB3784 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nullifying Unconstitutional Mandate By Evaluating Results Act or the NUMBER Act - Repeals the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the health care provisions of the Health Care and Education and Reconciliation Act of 2010, effective as of their enactment, unless the Comptroller General certifies to Congress that at least 7 million individuals have been successfully enrolled in qualified health plans through a health care exchange during the enrollment period ending on March 31, 2014.
Title
Nullifying Unconstitutional Mandate By Evaluating Results Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Kerry Bentivolio [R-MI] | Rep. Jim Bridenstine [R-OK] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Phil Gingrey [R-GA] | Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA] |
Rep. Ralph Hall [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Matt Salmon [R-AZ] |
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Steve Stockman [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2013-12-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to House Appropriations |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to House Rules |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3803 (Same As) 2013-12-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Congressional oversight
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Congressional oversight
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3784/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3784/BILLS-113hr3784ih.pdf |