US HB3722 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress

Status

Status: Introduced on December 12 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-01-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that for purposes of medical professional liability insurance or civil and criminal malpractice liability determinations, a physician or athletic trainer (covered sports medicine professional) who is authorized to practice medicine in a state (primary state) and who provides medical services to an athlete or athletic team in a state where such professional is not authorized to practice (secondary state) shall be deemed to have provided such medical services in the primary state, provided that prior to providing the covered medical services such professional has disclosed the nature and extent of such services to the entity that provides such professional with medical professional liability insurance in the primary state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide protections for certain sports medicine professionals who provide certain medical services in a secondary State.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
2014-01-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
2013-12-13HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2013-12-12HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2013-12-12HouseReferred to House Energy and Commerce
2013-12-12HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Same As/Similar To

SB2220 (Same As) 2014-04-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback