US HB3722 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 118-380, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 118-380, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require a pilot program on activities under the pre-separation transition process of members of the Armed Forces for a reduction in suicide among veterans, and for other purposes.
Title
Daniel J. Harvey, Jr. and Adam Lambert Improving Servicemember Transition to Reduce Veteran Suicide Act
Sponsors
Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA] | Rep. Seth Magaziner [D-RI] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] |
Rep. Jennifer Kiggans [R-VA] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 118-380, Part I. |
2023-12-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-15 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-11-15 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-02 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2023-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB132 (Related) 2023-02-16 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/3722/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr3722/BILLS-118hr3722ih.pdf |