US HB3676 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 345.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 345.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting In-Flight Voice Communications on Mobile Wireless Devices Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) to issue regulations prohibiting an individual on an aircraft from engaging in voice communications using a mobile device during a flight in scheduled passenger interstate or intrastate air transportation. Exempts from such prohibition: (1) on-duty flight crews and attendants, and (2) federal law enforcement officers acting in an official capacity.
Title
Prohibiting In-Flight Voice Communications on Mobile Wireless Devices Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA] | Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] |
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] |
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] |
Rep. Janice Hahn [D-CA] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] |
Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Thomas Petri [R-WI] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] |
Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] | Rep. Steve Southerland [R-FL] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] |
Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 345. |
2014-05-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-466. |
2014-02-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2014-02-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-02-11 | House | Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged. |
2013-12-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2013-12-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Aviation and airports
Department of Transportation
Telephone and wireless communication
Transportation and public works
Aviation and airports
Department of Transportation
Telephone and wireless communication
Transportation and public works