US HB3641 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EPA Maximum Achievable Contraction of Technocrats Act of 2013 - Directs the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to take actions necessary to to ensure that the total number of EPA employees 3 years after the last day of the second month beginning on or after the date of enactment of this Act does not exceed the total number of employees on that earlier date, reduced by 15%. Sets forth reporting requirements concerning compliance with such reductions, including extensions of deadlines, if any.
Title
EPA Maximum Achievable Contraction of Technocrats Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] |
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture. |
2013-12-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2013-12-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy. |
2013-12-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2013-12-03 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2013-12-03 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2013-12-03 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2013-12-03 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-12-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3641/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3641/BILLS-113hr3641ih.pdf |