US HB3608 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-290.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-290.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Grand Portage Band Per Capita Adjustment Act - Excludes funds paid by Minnesota to members of the Grand Portage Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, pursuant to the agreements of such Band to voluntarily restrict tribal rights to hunt and fish in territory ceded under the Treaty of September 30, 1854, from: (1) federal or state income taxes; or (2) use in denying or reducing a member's benefits under the Social Security Act or, except for payments in excess of $2,000, a federal or federally-assisted program.
Title
Grand Portage Band Per Capita Adjustment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-290. |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6924) |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2014-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8017) |
2014-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3608. |
2014-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8017-8019) |
2014-11-17 | House | Mr. Labrador moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-11-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 466. |
2014-11-17 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2014-11-17 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2014-11-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-625, Part I. |
2014-09-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2014-07-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2013-11-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2013-11-21 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-11-21 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-11-21 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-11-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2249 (Same As) 2014-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Federal-Indian relations
Hunting and fishing
Income tax exclusion
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Minnesota
Native Americans
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social security and elderly assistance
Hunting and fishing
Income tax exclusion
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Minnesota
Native Americans
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social security and elderly assistance