US HB3522 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-15 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-15 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Employee Health Care Protection Act of 2014 - Permits a health insurance issuer that has in effect health insurance coverage in the group market on any date during 2013 to continue offering such coverage for sale through 2018 outside of a health care exchange established under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. Treats such coverage as a grandfathered health plan for purposes of an individual meeting the requirement to maintain minimum essential health coverage.
Title
Employee Health Care Protection Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] |
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Lee Terry [R-NE] |
Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
Roll Calls
2014-09-11 - House - On Passage (Y: 247 N: 167 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-11 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 187 N: 223 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-09-11 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 187 N: 223 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2014-09-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-09-11 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 247 - 167 (Roll no. 495). (text: CR 9/10/2014 H7413) |
2014-09-11 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 187 - 223 (Roll no. 494). |
2014-09-11 | House | The previous question on the motion was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H7437) |
2014-09-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Brownley (CA) motion to recommit with instruction, pending reservation of a point of order. The motion seeks to ensure that nothing in the underlying legislation would result in discrimination based on gender, including subjecting women to higher premiums, loss of coverage for contraception or loss of coverage for prenatal care. Subsequently, the reservation of a point of order was withdrawn. |
2014-09-11 | House | Ms. Brownley (CA) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (consideration: CR H7436-7437; text: CR H7436) |
2014-09-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7436-7438) |
2014-09-11 | House | The Chair announced that pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, further proceedings were resumed on H.R. 3522. |
2014-09-10 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair announced that pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, further proceedings on H.R. 3522 would be postponed. |
2014-09-10 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H7420) |
2014-09-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3522. |
2014-09-10 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3522 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution provides that an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 113-56, modified by the amendment printed in this report, shall be considered as adopted. |
2014-09-10 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 717. (consideration: CR H7413-7420) |
2014-09-10 | House | Rule H. Res. 717 passed House. |
2014-09-09 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 717 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3522 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution provides that an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 113-56, modified by the amendment printed in this report, shall be considered as adopted. |
2014-09-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 430. |
2014-09-08 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2014-09-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-580, Part I. |
2014-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 20. |
2014-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-11-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-11-18 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-11-18 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-11-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3350 (Related) 2013-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR717 (Related) 2014-09-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5453 (Related) 2014-09-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2808 (Related) 2014-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR717 (Related) 2014-09-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5453 (Related) 2014-09-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2808 (Related) 2014-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access